Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) Adult Traffic case against Churches, Linda Sue, in the jurisdiction of Calaveras County. This case was filed in Calaveras County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2008 |
CategoryAdult Traffic |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationCalaveras County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Case Cycle Time119 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 28, 2009 | Docket Event | Tickler | |
January 23, 2009 | Docket Event | Abstract to DMV | |
January 20, 2009 | Docket Event | Traffic School Complete | |
November 03, 2008 | Docket Event | Arraignment | |
October 28, 2008 | Docket Event | Traffic School Requested | |
September 24, 2008 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
September 24, 2008 | Docket Event | Citation | |
September 23, 2008 | Docket Event | TVS Fee |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.