Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) Adult Traffic case against Garren, Holly Lynn, in the jurisdiction of Calaveras County. This case was filed in Calaveras County Superior Courts with Swift, Hugh K. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 08, 2008 |
CategoryAdult Traffic |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationCalaveras County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Case Cycle Time99 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 11, 2013 | Docket Event | Returned from Collections | |
May 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Hold released per GC Services detail report | |
May 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Paid in full | |
May 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Release FTP-AB 103 | |
November 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Verification received from collections | |
October 21, 2011 | Docket Event | Other | |
July 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Modification Hearing
Judge: Swift, Hugh K. |
|
July 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 14, 2010 | Docket Event | Request / Motion for Continuance (Trial) | |
January 22, 2010 | Docket Event | Information Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.