Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) Adult Traffic case against Crawford, Thomas F., in the jurisdiction of Calaveras County. This case was filed in Calaveras County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 06, 2008 |
CategoryAdult Traffic |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationCalaveras County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Case Cycle Time136 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 08, 2008 | Docket Event | Abstract to DMV | |
June 25, 2008 | Docket Event | Tickler | |
June 23, 2008 | Docket Event | Traffic School Complete | |
March 25, 2008 | Docket Event | Traffic School Requested | |
March 24, 2008 | Docket Event | Arraignment | |
March 19, 2008 | Docket Event | Traffic School Requested | |
February 08, 2008 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
February 08, 2008 | Docket Event | Citation | |
February 06, 2008 | Docket Event | TVS Fee |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.