Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) Adult Traffic case against Lassen, Stacey Ann, in the jurisdiction of Calaveras County. This case was filed in Calaveras County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2008 |
CategoryAdult Traffic |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationCalaveras County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Case Cycle Time126 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2008 | Docket Event | Abstract to DMV | |
June 20, 2008 | Docket Event | Traffic School Complete | |
June 03, 2008 | Docket Event | Tickler | |
March 03, 2008 | Docket Event | Traffic School Requested | |
March 03, 2008 | Docket Event | Arraignment | |
February 15, 2008 | Docket Event | Citation | |
February 15, 2008 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
January 31, 2008 | Docket Event | TVS Fee |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.