Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) Adult Traffic case against Picco, Michael Ufford, in the jurisdiction of Calaveras County. This case was filed in Calaveras County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2005 |
CategoryAdult Traffic |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationCalaveras County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Case Cycle Time47 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2006 | Docket Event | Tickler | |
February 15, 2006 | Docket Event | Traffic School Complete | |
February 15, 2006 | Docket Event | Abstract to DMV | |
February 06, 2006 | Docket Event | Arraignment | |
January 19, 2006 | Docket Event | Traffic School Requested | |
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event | Citation | |
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event | TVS Fee |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.