Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) Adult Traffic case against Smalley, Preston Grant, in the jurisdiction of Calaveras County. This case was filed in Calaveras County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2005 |
CategoryAdult Traffic |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationCalaveras County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Case Cycle Time174 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 22, 2006 | Docket Event | Traffic School Complete | |
June 22, 2006 | Docket Event | Abstract to DMV | |
June 16, 2006 | Docket Event | Tickler | |
March 16, 2006 | Docket Event | Traffic School Requested | |
February 27, 2006 | Docket Event | Arraignment | |
February 24, 2006 | Docket Event | Change of Address | |
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event | Citation | |
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event | DMV | |
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event | TVS Fee |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.