Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Hohemi Valencia, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Lynne R. Meredith presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLynne R. Meredith Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 10, 2020 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Meredith, Lynne R |
|
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | 1st Appear by Date Extension | |
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Traffic Court Reminder Notice | |
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Mailing | |
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Citation | |
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Citation Filed | |
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Citation: Owner Responsibility |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.