Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Regno, Shelly Ann, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Lynne R. Meredith presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 27, 2019 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedJuly 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Correction | |
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear Letter | |
February 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear | |
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Meredith, Lynne R |
|
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Appear by Date Extension (Portal) | |
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Traffic Court Reminder Notice | |
November 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Citation Filed | |
November 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.