Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Christopher Jordan Turner, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Meredith, Lynne R presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 26, 2019 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Held | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | DMV Failure to Appear Release | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Financial Due Date | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | CAT Fees Addressed | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Meredith, Lynne R |
|
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear Letter | |
January 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear | |
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Meredith, Lynne R |
|
November 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Traffic Court Reminder Notice | |
November 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.