Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Rangel, Larissa Denae, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Meredith, Lynne presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2019 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedMarch 07, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
April 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Meredith, Lynne R |
|
April 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Bail Forfeiture | |
April 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Traffic Court Reminder Notice | |
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Citation | |
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Citation Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.