Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Adams, Famous Lyn, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Meredith, Lynne R presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 2018 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2020 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Case Cycle Time733 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Correction - Submitted in Court | |
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Meredith, Lynne R |
|
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Arraignment Held | |
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Financial Due Date | |
December 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear | |
February 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Orzel, Erin |
|
December 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Traffic Court Reminder Notice | |
December 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Citation Filed | |
December 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.