Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Destiny Gonzalez, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Meredith, Lynne presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2018 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 20, 2020 | Docket Event | *Collections: Updated Information | |
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event | *Collections: Updated Information | |
June 17, 2020 | Docket Event | *Collections: Updated Information | |
May 19, 2020 | Docket Event | *Collections: Updated Information | |
April 06, 2020 | Docket Event | *Collections: Updated Information | |
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event | *Collections: Updated Information | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | *Failure to Pay: Pending FTB | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | *Collections: Sent to FTB | |
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Failure to Pay Letter | |
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Failure to Pay |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.