Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Katrisha Joungsu Lee, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Lynne R. Meredith presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2018 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear Traffic School | |
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event | *TVS Failure to Appear: Letter | |
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear Traffic School | |
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Traffic School Certificate Filed | |
August 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Voucher | |
August 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Order for Disbursement | |
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Traffic School Referral in Court | |
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Trial de Novo
Judge: Meredith, Lynne R |
|
April 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Order Granted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.