Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Oguzhan Unluer, represented by Campbell, Gary G, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Meredith, Lynne R presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 10, 2018 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
June 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Voucher | |
May 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
May 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Meredith, Lynne R |
|
March 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Statement of Trust Deposit | |
March 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Court Trial Scheduled | |
March 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Arraignment Waived | |
March 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Over The Counter Minute Order
Judge: Meredith, Lynne R |
|
March 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Advisement of Rights, Plea and Request for Court Trial | |
January 18, 2019 | Docket Event | 1st Appear by Date Extension |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.