Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Burrell, Rayshawne Corey, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Lynne R. Meredith presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 17, 2021 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedMarch 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event | *Collections: Updated Information | |
November 19, 2020 | Docket Event | *Collections: Updated Information | |
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event | *Collections: Updated Information | |
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event | *Collections: Updated Information | |
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event | *Collections: Updated Information | |
June 26, 2020 | Docket Event | *Collections: Updated Information | |
May 12, 2020 | Docket Event | *Collections: Updated Information | |
April 03, 2020 | Docket Event | *Collections: Updated Information | |
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event | *Collections: Updated Information | |
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event | *Collections: Sent to MSB |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.