Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Colfin A1-Ca 4 Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Kimball Tirey & Stjohn Llp, against Alasdair M. Mcaulay, Williamina S. Mcaulay, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Gordon R. Burkhart presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer (Residential) Under $10K (Te)&Nbsp; |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions21 days |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time122 days |
PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ATTACHED TO THE COMPLAINT
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00JUDGMENT RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO ORIGINATING COURT.
Date: April 30, 2014UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER CCP 585(D)) FILED.
Date: March 19, 2014SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00DECLARATION OF OF PLAINTIFF RE: OWNERSHIP FILED
Date: March 19, 2014CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT T1 (UNLAWFUL DETAINER (TEMECULA)
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT < $10,000 (TEMECULA) FILED, SUMMONS ISSUED.
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.
Date: 2014-01-21T00:00:00DECL/ORDER RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO ORIGINATING COURT.
Date: April 30, 2014ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE SET 3/07/14 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. T1
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00DEFAULT JUDGMENT REVIEW - WESTERN (NON-APPEARANCE) SET 4/29/14 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. DJW.
Date: April 10, 2014CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92530.
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 01/21/14
Date: 2014-01-21T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.