Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Fairfield Winchester 1800 Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Kimball Tirey & Stjohn Llp, against Christianne Marie Babb, represented by Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Joan F. Burgess presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer (Residential) Under $10K (Te)&Nbsp; |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions24 days |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time66 days |
FEE WAIVER FOR CHRISTIANNE MARIE BABB WAS GRANTED FOR UD ANSWER; $255.00 WAIVED.
Date: 2014-01-03T00:00:00WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY
Date: January 24, 2014CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT T1 (UNLAWFUL DETAINER (TEMECULA)
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92596.
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE SET 3/07/14 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. T1
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT < $10,000 (TEMECULA) FILED, SUMMONS ISSUED.
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY CHRISTIANNE MARIE BABB (FORM FW-001).
Date: 2014-01-03T00:00:00UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER SET FOR 1/24/14, AT 8:00, IN DEPT T1
Date: January 08, 2014JUDGMENT BY STIPULATION; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER JOAN F BURGESS .
Date: January 24, 2014FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.
Date: March 03, 2014For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.