Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Asset Acceptance Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Brown, Timothy S., against Cheryl L Christopher, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 11, 2012 |
CategoryCollection Assignee Decl. Crc 3.740 (Southwest)&Nbsp; |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions136 days |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time505 days |
DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT T1 FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES (COLLECTION) TEMECULA.
Date: December 11, 2012HEARING RE OSC FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT SET 12/12/13 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. T1.
Date: December 11, 2012JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK FILED 04/26/13
Date: April 26, 2013EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT
Date: April 24, 2013COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED - COLLECTION - TEMECULA.
Date: December 11, 2012CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92567.
Date: 2012-12-11T00:00:00DECLARATION OF PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 395(B) FILED
Date: 2012-12-11T00:00:00LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTIONS ASSIGNEE DECLARATION CRC 3.740 FILED (TEMECULA).
Date: 2012-12-11T00:00:00DECLARATION RE: BP 63221 FILED BY ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC (TEMECULA)
Date: 2012-12-11T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - TEMECULA) FILED 12/11/2012 OF ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC AND FILED.
Date: 2012-12-11T00:00:00DECLARATION RE COSTS PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1033 FILED BY ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC
Date: April 24, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.