Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Target National Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Law Offices Of Patenaude & Felix Apc, against Sarah C Atkinson, represented by Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Kenneth W. Andreen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKenneth W. Andreen Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management68 days |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryCollection Crc 3.740-Under $10,000 (Southwest)&Nbsp; |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time910 days |
DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT T1 FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES (COLLECTION) TEMECULA.
Date: 2010-12-30T00:00:00REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY SARAH C ATKINSON (FORM FW-001).
Date: 2011-03-08T00:00:00DATE TO SET OSC FOR DESTRUCTION (DISMISSAL) IS SET 9/24/12 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. TEDST
Date: September 23, 2011CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY TARGET NATIONAL BANK
Date: September 15, 2011FEE WAIVER FOR SARAH C ATKINSON WAS GRANTED FOR ANSWER; $255.00 WAIVED.
Date: March 23, 2011REQUEST FOR HEARING ABOUT COURT FEE WAIVER ORDER FILED BY SARAH C ATKINSON (FW-006).
Date: 2011-03-21T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.
Date: 2010-12-30T00:00:00CMCCT HEARING SET FOR 10/06/11 AT 10:00 IS VACATED -FOR THE REASON: NOTICE REPRINTED
Date: 2011-03-08T00:00:00FEE WAIVER DENIED-PAY WITHIN 10 DAYS SET 3/29/11 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. FWTE.
Date: 2011-03-15T00:00:00HEARING RE OSC FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT SET 6/27/13 AT 10:00 IN DEPT. T1.
Date: 2010-12-30T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - TEMECULA) FILED 12/30/2010 OF TARGET NATIONAL BANK AND FILED.
Date: 2010-12-30T00:00:00NOTICE OF HEARING ABOUT COURT FEES FILED (FW-007).
Date: March 23, 2011REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED
Date: September 23, 2011FEE WAIVER RETURNED SET 3/10/11 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. FWTE.
Date: 2011-03-08T00:00:00LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTION UNDER $10,000 CRC 3.740 FILED
Date: 2010-12-30T00:00:00COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED - COLLECTION - TEMECULA.
Date: 2010-12-30T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING (COLLECTION)-TEMECULA SET 10/06/11 AT 10:00 IN DEPT. T1.
Date: 2011-03-08T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.