Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Chase Bank Usa, Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Hunt & Henriques, against Carol L Larkins, represented by Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 10, 2010 |
CategoryCollection Crc 3.740-Under $10,000 (Southwest)&Nbsp; |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time1252 days |
LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTION UNDER $10,000 CRC 3.740 FILED
Date: 2010-12-10T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF CMC HEARING.
Date: January 05, 2011SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - TEMECULA) FILED 12/10/2010 OF CHASE BANK USA, NA AND FILED.
Date: 2010-12-10T00:00:00HEARING RE OSC FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT SET 5/15/14 AT 10:00 IN DEPT. T1.
Date: 2010-12-10T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - TEMECULA SET FOR 6/23/11 AT 10:00 IN DEPT. T1
Date: January 05, 2011CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CHASE BANK USA, NA
Date: March 25, 2011DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT T1 FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES (COLLECTION) TEMECULA.
Date: 2010-12-10T00:00:00COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED - COLLECTION - TEMECULA.
Date: 2010-12-10T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.
Date: 2010-12-10T00:00:00HOFDJT HEARING SET FOR 05/15/14 AT 10:00 IS VACATED -FOR THE REASON: ANSWER FILED
Date: January 05, 2011REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED
Date: May 06, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.