Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Rpv Investment Group, Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Duringer, Stephen C, against Floretta Bobbi Crenshaw, Ardie Crenshaw, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 07, 2010 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer (Residential) Under $10K (Te)&Nbsp; |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions22 days |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 12/29/10
Date: 2010-12-29T00:00:00JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED . SIGNED BY HONORABLE DAO1.
Date: October 14, 2011WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR THE COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE
Date: 2010-12-29T00:00:00PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ATTACHED TO THE COMPLAINT
Date: 2010-12-07T00:00:00LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT < $10,000 (TEMECULA) FILED, SUMMONS ISSUED.
Date: 2010-12-07T00:00:00DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER CCP 585(D)) FILED.
Date: September 26, 2011CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.
Date: 2010-12-07T00:00:00WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SATISFIED
Date: December 13, 2011SUMMONS ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 12/07/2010 OF RPV INVESTMENT GROUP, LLC FILED
Date: 2010-12-07T00:00:00ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE SET 2/22/11 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. T1U
Date: 2010-12-07T00:00:00APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED (FORM RI-003).
Date: 2010-12-29T00:00:00CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER
Date: 2010-12-07T00:00:00APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.
Date: 2010-12-21T00:00:00REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DEFAULT BY CLERK PREVIOUSLY ENTERED) FILED.
Date: September 26, 2011WRIT OF POSSESSION FORWARDED TO SHERIFF'S COURT SERVICES.
Date: 2010-12-29T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.