Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Pamituan Pablo, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Rivera Maria Elenita, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Stephen M. Lowry presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 18, 2014 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions45 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time398 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Pamituan, Pablo - Filed and Entered on 2015-09-21 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Compton Dept. - M, Lowry, Stephen M., Presiding Default Prove Up Trial - Judgment - Default After Prove Up Judge: Stephen M. |
|
May 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Compton Dept. - M, Lowry, Stephen M., Presiding Default Prove Up Trial - Not Held - Continued - Court's Own Motion Judge: Stephen M. |
|
February 19, 2015 | Docket Event | Assigned to Court (Entered Date: 04-09-15 ) | |
February 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Pamituan, Pablo - Filed and Entered on 2015-09-21 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Pamituan, Pablo - Filed and Entered on 2015-02-19 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request - Enter Default FL165 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Pamituan, Pablo ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (& Final - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Pamituan, Pablo - Filed and Entered on 2014-10-03 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Pamituan, Pablo ) Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.