Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Fernandez Oscar, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Bruers Stuart Edward, against Fernandez Ana, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Angela J. Davis presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 19, 2004 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1938 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time1960 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record Filed by Respondent |
|
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Department 22, Powell, Michael R., Presiding Trial Setting Conference - Off Calendar - Court's Own Motion Judge: Michael R. |
|
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judgment Filed by Respondent |
|
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment Filed by Respondent |
|
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure Filed by Respondent |
|
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default FL170 Filed by Respondent |
|
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers Filed by Respondent |
|
December 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - Stipulated (426 Reviewed ) Filed by Respondent |
|
November 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice (re OSC - Entry of Judgmt ) Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.