Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Jenkins Darryl, Jenkins Lynne, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Bayview Loan Servicing Llc, The Bank Of New York Mellon, The Bank Of New York Not In Its, represented by Ascherin Preston Konow, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Compton Courthouse with Maurice A. Leiter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaurice A. Leiter Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management146 days |
Filing DateAugust 09, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions307 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseCompton Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Before Trial - Lack Of Prosecution |
Case Cycle Time190 days |
Complaint
Date: August 09, 2018Complaint -
Date: August 09, 2018Notice of Case Management Conference -
Date: August 09, 2018Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: August 09, 2018Summons -
Date: August 09, 2018Summons
Date: August 09, 2018Answer
Date: September 10, 2018Answer -
Date: September 10, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: January 31, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: February 19, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)
Date: February 15, 2019Substitution of Attorney
Date: March 26, 2019Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal
Date: March 26, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF NON-RECEIPT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO VACATE ORDER OF DISMISSAL
Date: April 16, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: April 22, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: May 29, 2019Motion to Consolidate
Date: July 24, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: September 06, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: August 20, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: August 30, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF PRESTON K. ASCHERIN
Date: August 30, 2019Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: August 30, 2019Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: September 06, 2019Separate Statement - SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTIN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: September 06, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF JAMIE E. WRIGHT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: September 06, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Date: October 08, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS; ORDER TO SHO...)
Date: September 26, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: September 27, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE
Date: October 08, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: October 09, 2019Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ERRATA
Date: October 09, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: October 22, 2019Order - ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Date: November 07, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER
Date: November 20, 2019Substitution of Attorney
Date: January 31, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: March 12, 2020Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment
Date: March 12, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: July 16, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: July 31, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER
Date: July 31, 2020Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: August 05, 2020Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: August 07, 2020Appeal - Notice of Default Issued
Date: September 17, 2020Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: September 30, 2020Appeal - Notice of Default Issued
Date: November 13, 2020Order - ORDER ON APPELLANT'S PROPOSED SETTLED STATEMENT
Date: April 28, 2021Appeal Document - APPEAL DOCUMENT B307030, NA8/5/20; DCA ORDER;
Date: July 13, 2021Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: August 24, 2021Proposed Statement on Appeal Submitted APP-104 CR-135/143 - APPELLANT’S PROPOSED SETTLED STATEMENT
Date: September 21, 2021Order - ORDER ON APPELLANT'S PROPOSED SETTLED STATEMENT (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE)
Date: December 07, 2021Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal
Date: December 08, 2021Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - AFFIRMED B307030
Date: May 17, 2023Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-08-09T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-08-09T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-08-09T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-01-02T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-08-09T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Case Management Conference) of 01/02/2019)
Date: 2019-01-02T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...))
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (CCP 473)))
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Notice (of Non-Receipt of Opposition to Motion to Vacate Order of Dismissal)
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Reply (Supporting Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Request for Judicial Notice)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Order to Sho...))
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...))
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Errata)
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Vacate Judgment)
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment])
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Motion to Consolidate
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Order Granting Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473)) of 04/09/2020)
Date: 2020-04-09T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Order to Sho...))
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Separate Statement (of Undisputed Facts in Support of Motin for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Opposition ( to Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice)
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Opposition ( to Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Declaration (of Jamie E. Wright in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Consolidate by Darryl Jenkins and Lynne ...))
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Declaration ( of Darryl Jenkins and Lynne Jenkins in Support of their Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Declaration (OF PRESTON K. ASCHERIN)
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473)))
Date: 2020-04-09T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment or Order)
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473)))
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order)
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) (NOA:8/5/20)
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.