Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Agustin Gonzalez, Agustin Gonzalez Jr., Cortes Miguel, Gonzalez Agustin, Miguel Cortes, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Graham Daniel M. Law Offices Of ., against Carroll Shelby Engine Co., Denbeste Engine Co. Llc, Does 1 To 100 Inclusive, represented by Aqui Diane, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Brian S. Currey presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 06, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedMay 16, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions403 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time538 days |
Summons
Date: 2016-10-06T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-10-06T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-10-06T00:00:00Notice-Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-10-06T00:00:00Cross-Compl fld - Summons Issued
Date: 2017-01-11T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-01-11T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2017-02-07T00:00:00First Amended Cross-Complaint
Date: 2017-02-06T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (CIVIL DEPOSIT JURY FEES POSTED )
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-02-07T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed
Date: 2017-01-11T00:00:00First Amended Cross-Complaint
Date: 2017-02-06T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-01-11T00:00:00Notice (OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT & REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL )
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00Summons Filed (ON THE X-COMPLT. OF DENBESTE ENGINE CO., LLC )
Date: 2017-01-11T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Second Amended Cross-Complaint
Date: 2017-03-01T00:00:00Second Amended Cross-Complaint
Date: 2017-03-01T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00Demurrer (TO 2ND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLT. )
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00Motion to Strike (PORTIONS OF THE 2ND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLT; )
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2017-04-20T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-04-26T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-04-20T00:00:00Notice (OF MOVEMENT OF ALL CASES PENDING IN DEPT. B TO DEPT. A PURSUANT TO COURT'S ORDER )
Date: 2017-04-26T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2017-04-27T00:00:00Reply (TO X-COMPLT. OPPOSITIION TO THE DEMURRER TO THE 2ND AMENDED X-COMPLT. )
Date: 2017-04-27T00:00:00Reply (TO X-COMPLT'S OPPOSITION TO MTN TO STRIEK PORTIONS OF THE 2ND AMENDED X-COMPLT. )
Date: 2017-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-05-08T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION AND ORDER TO PROTECT CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION )
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2017-05-18T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Notice of Continuance (OF POST MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE; )
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Answer to Amended Cross-Complaint
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-09-26T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2017-09-26T00:00:00Points and Authorities (MEMORANDUM OF P&A IN SUPPORT OF MSJ )
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00Declaration (OF JOE CONWAY IN SUPPORT OF DEFT'S MSJ )
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MSJ )
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00Declaration (OF JESSICA SOULIE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MSJ )
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00Declaration (OF LORI DENBESTE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MSJ )
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Exhibit (IN SUPPORT OF MSJ )
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (SEPARATE SATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MSJ )
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00Memo of Costs
Date: 2017-11-21T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00Memo of Costs ((Summary) $4276.51 )
Date: 2017-11-21T00:00:00Notice (OF CHANGED HEARING DATE )
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-01-08T00:00:00Opposition (TO MOTION TO STRIKE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TAX COSTS; )
Date: 2018-01-08T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs
Date: 2017-11-21T00:00:00Motion to Strike (OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TAX COSTS )
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs
Date: 2017-11-21T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-01-10T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-01-10T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Objection Document Filed
Date: 2018-01-10T00:00:00Objection Document Filed (TO EVIDENCE FILED IN OPPOSITION TO MSJ )
Date: 2018-01-10T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Points and Authorities (IN OPPOSITION TO MSJ )
Date: 2018-01-10T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2018-01-10T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Objection Document Filed
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Points and Authorities (IN OPPOSITION TO PLTF'S MSJ )
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (JOINT APPENDIX OF EXHIBITS FOR TRIAL )
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00List of Witnesses
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Reply (TO X-COMPLT'S OPPOSITION TO X-DEFTS MSJ )
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Objection Document Filed (& RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLTFS SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF ITS MSJ )
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Objection Document Filed
Date: 2018-02-06T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (pltf's NOTIFICATION OF INTENT TO PRESENT VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITIONS AT TIME OF TRIAL )
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (PLTF'S SUPPLEMENT TO JOINT WITNESS LIST )
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Objection Document Filed
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Notice (OF OSC RE: DISMISSAL )
Date: February 21, 2018Objection Document Filed
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Notice-Settlement
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Objection Document Filed (TO EVIDENCE IN REPLY TO X-COMPLT'S OPPOSITION TO X-DEFTS MSJ )
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Reply to Opposition (TO MTN FOR SJ OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY ADJ )
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Objection Document Filed (TO PTLF'S INTENT TO PRESENT VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITIONS AT TIME OF TRIAL )
Date: 2018-02-06T00:00:00Reply (TO PLTF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TAX COSTS )
Date: 2018-01-12T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Objection Document Filed (TO PLTF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF ITS MSJ )
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Statement of Case (JOINT STATEMENT OF THE CASE )
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Memorandum - Other
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Objection Document Filed
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00Response
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2018-01-12T00:00:00Jury Instructions (PRELIMINARY JOINT (PROPOSED) CACI JURY INSTRUCTIONS )
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Jury Instructions (JOINT (PROPOSED) CACI JURY INSTRUCTIONS )
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Notice
Date: March 20, 2018Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: March 21, 2018Request for Dismissal
Date: March 28, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.