Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Heritage Pacific Financial, Heritage Pacific Financial Llc, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Mokri & Associates Law Offices Of, against Does 1 Through 10 Inclusive, Hernandez Juan, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Compton Courthouse with Rose Hom presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 10, 2010 |
CategoryContractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions64 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
|
Filing Court HouseCompton Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed - Other |
Case Cycle Time247 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Paper file destroyed Filed by Court Filed by Court |
|
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Paper file destroyed Filed by Court |
|
January 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order (BY JUDGE WILLIAM BARRY TO FILE ORDERS FROM LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT CAS NO. TC024350 IN ALL LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT CASES WITH THE PLAINTIFF HERITAGE PACIFIC FINANCIAL) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
January 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order (BY JUDGE WILLIAM BARRY TO FILE ORDERS FROM LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT CAS NO. TC024350 IN ALL LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT CASES WITH THE PLAINTIFF HERITAGE PACIFIC FINANCIAL) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
November 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Dismissal (WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
November 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Dismissal (WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice-Settlement Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice-Settlement Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
August 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department A, Rose Hom, Presiding Conference-Case Management - Matter continued Conference-Case Management - Matter continued Judge: Rose Hom |
|
August 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department A, Rose Hom, Presiding Conference-Case Management - Matter continued Judge: Rose Hom |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.