Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Alejandre Cristina, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Matusek Ii Henry John, O'Neil Thomas J., against Super Center Concepts Inc., Superior Super Warehouse, represented by Dolan & Associates, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Compton Courthouse with William Barry presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 10, 2010 |
CategoryPremises Liablty (E.G. Slip & Fall (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Filing Court HouseCompton Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed - Other |
Case Cycle Time434 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Paper file destroyed Filed by Court |
|
May 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department ADRO, ADR Neutral, Presiding Closed-ADR (Richard A. Fisher, MediatorLocation: 16133 Ventura Boulevard,Suite 700, Encino, CA 91436) - Not Held-Rmvd ADR-Dismissed prior Judge: ADR Neutral |
|
April 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department B, William Barry, Presiding Order to Show Cause (OSC RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TOCRC, RULE 3.1385(B);) - Off Calendar Judge: William Barry |
|
April 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
March 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department B, William Barry, Presiding Jury Trial (5 DAY ESTIMATE*notice of settlement filed3/04/11* CM) - Cause off calendar - settled Judge: William Barry |
|
March 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice-Settlement Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
March 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (WITNESS LIST ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
March 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
March 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (JURY INSTRUCTIONS LIST ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
February 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department B, William Barry, Presiding Final Status Conference (TRL 3/7/1112/13/2010) - Conference held, trial to stand Judge: William Barry |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.