Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
LOURDES CEDILLO VS. L.A. COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION
On December 05, 2006 an other pi/pd/wd (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge William Barry presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 05, 2006
Last Refreshed
February 07, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Compton Courthouse
Category
Other PI/PD/WD (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
General Torts
Case Outcome Type
Dismissed - Other
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
1 year, 5 months and 22 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Paper file destroyed Filed by Court Filed by Court |
|
March 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Paper file destroyed Filed by Court |
|
May 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department B, William Barry, Presiding Order to Show Cause (RE DISMISSAL) - Case dismissed/disposed Order to Show Cause (RE DISMISSAL) - Case dismissed/disposed Judge: William Barry |
|
May 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department B, William Barry, Presiding Order to Show Cause (RE DISMISSAL) - Case dismissed/disposed Judge: William Barry |
|
May 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department B, William Barry, Presiding Final Status Conference (TRL *NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED ON*) - Matter continued Final Status Conference (TRL 5/12/08*NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED ON03/27/08*) - Matter continued Judge: William Barry |
|
May 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department B, William Barry, Presiding Final Status Conference (TRL 5/12/08*NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED ON03/27/08*) - Matter continued Judge: William Barry |
|
March 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice-Settlement Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
March 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice-Settlement Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
February 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order (ORDER RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE MEDIATION COMPLETION DEADLINE, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE, AND TRIAL DATES ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
February 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order (ORDER RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE MEDIATION COMPLETION DEADLINE, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE, AND TRIAL DATES ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
January 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
ExParte Application (to continue mediation completion deadline, final status conference and trial dates ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
January 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department B, William Barry, Presiding Ex-Parte Application - Denied Ex-Parte Application - Denied Judge: William Barry |
|
January 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department B, William Barry, Presiding Ex-Parte Application - Denied Judge: William Barry |
|
January 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
ExParte Application (to continue mediation completion deadline, final status conference and trial dates ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
January 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department B, William Barry, Presiding Conference-Post Mediation Status (FSC TRL ) - Matter continued Conference-Post Mediation Status (FSC 5/5/08TRL 5/12/08) - Matter continued Judge: William Barry |
|
January 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department B, William Barry, Presiding Conference-Post Mediation Status (FSC 5/5/08TRL 5/12/08) - Matter continued Judge: William Barry |
|
June 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order (RE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order (RE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department B, William Barry, Presiding Conference-Case Management (*COURT CALL APPEARANCE IS APPROVEDBY COURT ON FOR PLAINTIFFCOUNSEL/SAN DIEGO*) - Trial Date Set Conference-Case Management (*COURT CALL APPEARANCE IS APPROVEDBY COURT ON 5/30/07 FOR PLAINTIFFCOUNSEL/SAN DIEGO*) - Trial Date Set Judge: William Barry |
|
June 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department B, William Barry, Presiding Conference-Case Management (*COURT CALL APPEARANCE IS APPROVEDBY COURT ON 5/30/07 FOR PLAINTIFFCOUNSEL/SAN DIEGO*) - Trial Date Set Judge: William Barry |
|
May 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
May 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
May 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
May 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
March 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
March 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
February 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
February 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
February 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
February 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
January 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
January 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
December 05, 2006 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed | |
December 05, 2006 | Docket Event | Summons Filed | |
December 05, 2006 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed PROCEEDINGS HELD |