Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Sunlan-020105 Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Miele, Kenneth, against Ziegler Aka Dennis M. Ziegler Jr., Dennis M, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Phillips, Craig G. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2013 |
Category09-Cl <10K Rule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions69 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2282 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 30, 2019 | Hearing | Acknowledgment of Full Satisfaction | |
December 06, 2018 | Hearing |
Mail Returned Undelivered AS TO DENNIS M ZIEGLER |
|
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned Undelivered AS TO DENNIS M ZIEGLER |
|
November 15, 2018 | Hearing |
Claim of Exemption
Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
November 01, 2018 | Hearing |
Original Claim of Exemption filed. Opposition and Notice of Hearing Filed. |
|
November 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Original Claim of Exemption filed. Opposition and Notice of Hearing Filed. |
|
October 25, 2018 | Hearing | Notice of Opposition/Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption | |
October 19, 2018 | Hearing |
Original Claim of Exemption, Notice of Opposition and Notice of Hearing from Levying Officer. FILING IS NOT TIMELY |
|
October 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Original Claim of Exemption, Notice of Opposition and Notice of Hearing from Levying Officer. FILING IS NOT TIMELY |
|
July 09, 2018 | Hearing |
Writ of Execution Issued Los Angeles/E-File |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.