Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
James Roach, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Pro Per, against Boyd Roberts, represented by Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with John M. Monterosso presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategorySmall Claims-Over $1500/Under $5000 (Southwest)&Nbsp; |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Cycle Time259 days |
PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - OVER $1500 AND LESS THAN OR EQUAL TO $5000 FILED. (SOUTHWEST)
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00DECLARATION OF JOSEPH ANGELO GAGLIO FILED
Date: 2015-03-02T00:00:00CERTIFIED COPY(S) MADE.
Date: September 16, 2015DECLARATION OF JAMES ROACH FILED
Date: 2015-05-04T00:00:00ACTIVE MILITARY DUTY AS TO NONE (SOUTHWEST).
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00SMALL CLAIMS CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT S205. (SOUTHWEST)
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: RULING ON SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL.
Date: 2015-05-08T00:00:00SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S103 - SOUTHWEST
Date: 2015-04-09T00:00:00SMALL CLAIMS HEARING SET ON 3/12/15, AT 8:00, IN DEPT. S205 (SOUTHWEST).
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FOR JUDGMENT DEBTOR, BOYD ROBERTS FILED.
Date: September 16, 2015NOTICE OF ENTRY OF SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT FILED.
Date: 2015-03-12T00:00:00ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED
Date: May 22, 2015CLAIM AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00MOTION FEE PAID BY JAMES ROACH FOR 60.00.
Date: June 23, 2015For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.