Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
County Of San Joaquin, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Jones, Scott Edwin, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts with McCann, Cheryl A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2023 |
CategoryFamily Support Registration In State Support Order |
Last RefreshedMarch 18, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Corrected Notice of Registration of California Support Order filed by County of San Joaquin. | |
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Corrected Statement for Registration of California Support Order filed by County of San Joaquin. | |
January 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of service filed by County of San Joaquin. | |
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Motion (Governmental) Initial filed by County of San Joaquin. | |
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Hearing regarding: Notice of Motion (Governmental)-Initial DCSS' NOM reg child support, health care, payment on arrears, set for 03/18/2024 at 8:15 AM before Hon. Cheryl A. McCann in Department 5A. | |
December 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Regarding Payment of Support filed by County of San Joaquin. Payee is DCSS. | |
December 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Case associated with case: , STA-FL-DWC-2011-0002952 | |
December 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Administrative Disposition as to County of San Joaquin, Scott Edwin Jones, Kimberly Rose Jones. | |
December 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Registration of California Support Order filed by County of San Joaquin. | |
December 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Case status updated to Disposed. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.