Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
County Of San Joaquin, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Blackburn, Michael Lavell, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts with McCann, Cheryl A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2023 |
CategoryFamily Support Registration In State Support Order |
Last RefreshedApril 10, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of service filed by County of San Joaquin. | |
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Motion(Governmental) Mod filed by County of San Joaquin. | |
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Hearing regarding: Notice of Motion (Governmental)-Mod DCSS' NOM MOD reg. Child Support, Health Care, Payment on Arrears, set for 04/10/2024 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Cheryl A. McCann in Department 5A. | |
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Regarding Payment of Support filed by County of San Joaquin. | |
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Case status updated to Disposed. | |
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Registration of California Support Order filed by County of San Joaquin. | |
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Administrative Disposition as to County of San Joaquin, Michael Lavell Blackburn, Asiana Freeman. | |
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Statement for Registration of California Support Order filed by County of San Joaquin. | |
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Case initiated. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.