Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
County Of San Joaquin, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Phimmasone, Daniel Seng, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts with McCann, Cheryl A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 21, 2023 |
CategoryFamily Support Complaint |
Last RefreshedApril 15, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Motion (Governmental) Initial filed by County of San Joaquin. | |
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event | Hearing regarding: Notice of Motion (Governmental)-Initial DCSS' NOM reg. Child Support, Health Care, Judgment, set for 04/15/2024 at 9:30 AM before Hon. Cheryl A. McCann in Department 5A. | |
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Answer to Complaint or Supplemental Complaint Regarding Parental Obligations filed by Phimmasone, Daniel Seng. | |
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons as to Daniel Seng Phimmasone filed. Served on 12/06/2023. Method of Service: Personal Service | |
November 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Case initiated. | |
November 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons and Complaint or Supplemental Complaint Regarding Parental Obligations filed by County of San Joaquin. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.