Case Last Refreshed: 15 hours ago
Duncan, Kimahni, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case against Crate & Barrel Distribution Center, An Entity Form Unknown, Euromarket Designs, Inc., An Illinois Corporation, Lopez, Enrique, Sanchez, Alejandro, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Lee, Jayne presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 09, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Wrongful Termination |
Last RefreshedApril 30, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Duncan, Kimahni.
Date: September 09, 2020Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.
Date: September 09, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Duncan, Kimahni.
Date: September 09, 2020Order to Show Cause filed.
Date: March 10, 2021Summons issued and filed.
Date: September 09, 2020Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 03/10/2021 08:30 AM .
Date: March 10, 2021Notice of Change of Address filed by Duncan, Kimahni.
Date: August 02, 2021Case Management Statement filed by Duncan, Kimahni.
Date: June 29, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Duncan, Kimahni.
Date: September 09, 2020Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Duncan, Kimahni.
Date: September 09, 2020Case Management Statement filed by Duncan, Kimahni.
Date: June 29, 2021Summons issued and filed.
Date: September 09, 2020Notice of Change of Address filed by Duncan, Kimahni.
Date: August 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing Result: Vacated
Judge: Lee, Jayne |
|
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Removed to Federal Court.
Judge: Lee, Jayne |
|
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Defendants Euromarket Designs, Inc. and Alejandro Sanchez's Notice to Adverse Party and Stat Court of Removal Action filed by Sanchez, Alejandro; Euromarket Designs, Inc., an Illinois corporation. NOTICE FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE FILED RECORD SEALED Defendants Euromarket Designs, Inc. and Alejandro Sanchez's Notice to Adverse Party and Stat Court of Removal Action filed by Sanchez, Alejandro; Euromarket Designs, Inc., an Illinois corporation. Notice of Removal to Federal Court Judge: Lee, Jayne |
|
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE FILED RECORD SEALED Defendants Euromarket Designs, Inc. and Alejandro Sanchez's Notice to Adverse Party and Stat Court of Removal Action filed by Sanchez, Alejandro; Euromarket Designs, Inc., an Illinois corporation. Judge: Lee, Jayne |
|
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons as to Euromarket Designs, Inc., an Illinois corporation served on 07/14/2021 by Personal Service. $135.74. POS010 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address filed by Duncan, Kimahni. NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED RECORD SEALED Notice of Change of Address filed by Duncan, Kimahni. Notice of Change of Address Judge: Lee, Jayne |
|
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
POS010 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED RECORD SEALED Proof of Service of Summons as to Euromarket Designs, Inc., an Illinois corporation served on 07/14/2021 by Personal Service. $135.74. Judge: Lee, Jayne |
|
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED RECORD SEALED Notice of Change of Address filed by Duncan, Kimahni. Judge: Lee, Jayne |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.