Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Medina, Shaun, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case against Joshua, Vivian, United Parcel Service, Inc., in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Abdallah, George J. presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management185 days |
|
Filing DateAugust 09, 2019 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Wrongful Termination |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions45 days |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseStockton |
This complaint alleges various causes of action against United Parcel Service, Inc. (UPS) and other defendants. The plaintiff, Shaun Medina, claims that his employment with UPS was wrongfully terminated. The complaint includes claims of discriminatio...
Consent to Confer Separately During Settlement Conferences Filed
Date: March 07, 2022Plaintiff Shaun Medina’s First Amended Complaint filed by Medina, Shaun.
Date: March 16, 2022Trial Management Order filed.
Date: March 07, 2022Minutes finalized for Ex Parte held on 03/11/2022 09:15 AM .
Date: March 11, 2022Proof of service filed by United Parcel Service, Inc..
Date: March 18, 2022Tentative Ruling published.
Date: March 22, 2022Minutes finalized for Motion for Continuance held on 03/23/2022 09:00 AM .
Date: March 23, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Medina, Shaun.
Date: August 09, 2019Summons issued and filed.
Date: August 09, 2019Notice of Change of Address filed by Medina, Shaun.
Date: October 21, 2019Case Management Statement filed by United Parcel Service, Inc..
Date: March 15, 2021Proof of Service - Civil filed by United Parcel Service, Inc..
Date: January 29, 2020Substitution of Attorney filed by Medina, Shaun.
Date: February 11, 2020Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Medina, Shaun.
Date: August 09, 2019Proof of Service - Civil filed by United Parcel Service, Inc..
Date: January 24, 2020Case Management Statement filed by United Parcel Service, Inc..
Date: January 24, 2020Case Management Statement filed by Medina, Shaun.
Date: March 08, 2021Proof of service filed by United Parcel Service, Inc.
Date: December 16, 2021Order Appointing Official Reporter Pro Tempore, Vienna Nguyen, CSR #13137 filed.
Date: March 11, 2022Minutes finalized for Status Conference held on 08/23/2021 08:45 AM .
Date: August 23, 2021Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 10/27/2020 08:45 AM .
Date: October 27, 2020Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 02/10/2020 08:45 AM .
Date: February 10, 2020Notice of Transmittal.
Date: August 09, 2019Notice of Receiving Transferred Action.
Date: August 09, 2019Proof of service filed by United Parcel Service, Inc..
Date: March 10, 2022Notice of Association of Counsel filed by Medina, Shaun.
Date: March 10, 2022Minutes finalized for Mandatory Settlement Conference held on 03/07/2022 01:30 PM .
Date: March 07, 2022Minutes finalized for Miscellaneous Hearing held on 03/04/2022 01:30 PM .
Date: March 04, 2022Minutes finalized for Motion for Summary Judgment/Adj. held on 03/03/2022 09:00 AM .
Date: March 03, 2022Tentative Ruling published.
Date: March 02, 2022Plaintiff's Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement filed by Medina, Shaun.
Date: February 28, 2022Notice of Remote Appearance filed by Medina, Shaun.
Date: February 28, 2022Proof Of Service filed by United Parcel Service, Inc..
Date: February 25, 2022Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement filed by United Parcel Service, Inc..
Date: February 25, 2022Plaintiff’s Opposition To Defendant’s Motion For Summary Judgment filed by Medina, Shaun.
Date: February 16, 2022Proof of Service filed by United Parcel Service, Inc..
Date: February 08, 2022Proof of service filed by United Parcel Service, Inc..
Date: February 10, 2022Proof of service filed by United Parcel Service, Inc.
Date: December 16, 2021Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Medina, Shaun.
Date: August 09, 2019Case Management Statement filed by United Parcel Service, Inc..
Date: March 15, 2021Case Management Statement filed by Medina, Shaun.
Date: March 08, 2021Substitution of Attorney filed by Medina, Shaun.
Date: February 11, 2020Proof of Service - Civil filed by United Parcel Service, Inc..
Date: January 24, 2020Proof of Service - Civil filed by United Parcel Service, Inc..
Date: January 29, 2020Case Management Statement filed by United Parcel Service, Inc..
Date: January 24, 2020Notice of Change of Address filed by Medina, Shaun.
Date: October 21, 2019Summons issued and filed.
Date: August 09, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Medina, Shaun.
Date: August 09, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing regarding: Motion for Continuance Defendant's Motion to Continue Trial(briefing schedule: Pltf due by 3/15/22; Deft due by 3/18/22), set for 03/24/2022 at 9:00 AM before Hon. George J. Abdallah in Department 10A.
Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Continuance Defendant's Motion to Continue Trial(briefing schedule: Pltf due by 3/15/22; Deft due by 3/18/22) scheduled on 03/23/2022 at 9:00 AM has been Continued.
Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
MINUTE_ORDER RTF FILED RECORD SEALED Minutes finalized for Motion for Continuance held on 03/23/2022 09:00 AM . Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
TENTATIVERULING PROBATENOTE RTF FILED RECORD SEALED Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
OBJECTION FILED RECORD SEALED Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc.'s Objections to The Supplemental Declaration of Nazo Koulloukian In Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Continue Trial Due to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Filed on March 16, 2022 filed by United Parcel Service, Inc.. Objection Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
REPLY FILED RECORD SEALED Reply To Plaintiff Shaun Medina’s Opposition To Ups United Parcel Service, Inc.’S Motion To Continue Trial Due To Plaintiff’s Amended Complaint Filed On March 16, 2022 filed by United Parcel Service, Inc.. Reply Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED RECORD SEALED Declaration Of Nicholas Mckinney In Support Of Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc.’S Reply To Its Motion To Continue Trial Due To Plaintiff’s First Amended Complaint Filed On March 16, 2022 filed by United Parcel Service, Inc.. Declaration in Support Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
OBJECTION FILED RECORD SEALED Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc.’S Objections To The Declaration Of Nazo Koulloukian In Support Of Plaintiff’s Opposition To Defendant’s Motion To Continue Trial Due To Plaintiff’s Amended Complaint Filed On March 16, 2022 filed by United Parcel Service, Inc.. Objection Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE FILED RECORD SEALED Proof of service filed by United Parcel Service, Inc.. Proof of Service Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION FILED RECORD SEALED Supplemental Declaration of Nazo Koulloukian in Support of plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Continue Trial filed by Medina, Shaun. Supplemental Declaration - (Other) Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.