Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Kyatt, Kari Ann, Rhyne, David, Soto, Raul, filed a(n) General Property - Property case against Hyatt, Kari Ann, Kashiwamura, Glenn T., Rhyne, David, Select Properties Real Estate Sales & Management Services, A Sole Proprietorship, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Kronlund, Barbara presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 03, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseStockton |
**Set aside per order signed 01/22/2021** Request for Default against Kari Ann Hyatt Entered
Date: December 14, 2020Answer to complaint filed by Hyatt, Kari Ann.
Date: January 27, 2021Plaintiff's Notice of Case Management Conference filed by Soto, Raul.
Date: October 22, 2020Minutes finalized for Demurrer held on 11/20/2020 09:00 AM .
Date: November 20, 2020Tentative Ruling published.
Date: November 12, 2020Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Soto, Raul.
Date: June 03, 2020Summons issued and filed.
Date: June 03, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Soto, Raul.
Date: June 03, 2020Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.
Date: June 03, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE FILED RECORD SEALED Proof of Service filed by Kyatt, Kari Ann; Rhyne, David. Proof of Service Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
ANSWER FILED RECORD SEALED Answer to Complaint filed by Hyatt, Kari Ann; Rhyne, David. Answer Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED RECORD SEALED Stipulation & Order Setting Aside Default Against David Rhyne entered and filed. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Entry of Default Vacated.
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Payment received by David Rhyne in the amount of $20.00. Receipt number 694965.
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing Result: Vacated
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing regarding: Trial Setting Conference , set for 11/18/2021 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D.
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
MINUTEORDER RTF FILED RECORD SEALED Minutes finalized for Ex Parte held on 11/02/2021 08:30 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing re: Ex Parte held on November 2, 2021.
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing regarding: Ex Parte Defendant, David Rhyne's Ex Parte for OST on Motion to Set Aside Default, set for 11/02/2021 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D.
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.