Case Last Refreshed: 3 hours ago
Anaro, Felicia Jacinta, filed a(n) General Property - Property case against Ginnie Mae, Government National Mortgage Association As Trustee For Securitized Trust Ginnie Mae Remic Trust 2008-088, Mason-Mcduffie Mortgage Corporation, Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Aka Mers, U.S. Bank, N.A., (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Abdallah, George J. presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management184 days |
|
Filing DateOctober 23, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedMay 05, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Filing Court HouseStockton |
This complaint is filed by Felicia Anaro against Mason-McDuffie Mortgage Corporation, U.S. Bank, Government National Mortgage Association (Ginnie Mae), Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems (MERS), and other defendants. The plaintiff alleges sever...
Case Management Statement filed by Anaro, Felicia Jacinta.
Date: April 09, 2019Request for Default against Mason-Mcduffie Mortgage Corporation Denied
Date: April 15, 2019Summons issued and filed.
Date: October 23, 2018Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 04/23/2019 08:45 AM .
Date: April 23, 2019Tentative Ruling published.
Date: April 24, 2019Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Anaro, Felicia Jacinta.
Date: October 23, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Anaro, Felicia Jacinta.
Date: October 23, 2018Tentative Ruling published.
Date: September 11, 2019Tentative Ruling published.
Date: September 26, 2019Proof of service of CMC statement as to DEFT MERS filed by Anaro, Felicia Jacinta.
Date: April 15, 2019Request for Default against Ginnie Mae Not Entered
Date: April 22, 2019Tentative Ruling published.
Date: October 01, 2019Opposition to Defendant's Demurrer filed by Anaro, Felicia Jacinta.
Date: June 03, 2019Minutes finalized for Demurrer held on 09/12/2019 09:00 AM .
Date: September 12, 2019Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendants' Demurrer filed by Anaro, Felicia Jacinta.
Date: June 11, 2019Tentative Ruling published.
Date: June 13, 2019Minutes finalized for Demurrer held on 06/14/2019 09:00 AM .
Date: June 14, 2019Minutes finalized for Demurrer held on 10/03/2019 09:00 AM .
Date: October 03, 2019Case Management Statement filed by Anaro, Felicia Jacinta.
Date: December 18, 2019Amended Complaint filed by Anaro, Felicia Jacinta.
Date: October 21, 2019Tentative Ruling published.
Date: October 22, 2019Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 12/20/2019 08:45 AM .
Date: December 20, 2019Case Management Statement filed by Mason-Mcduffie Mortgage Corporation.
Date: December 05, 2019Tentative Ruling published.
Date: January 03, 2020Second Amended Complaint filed by Anaro, Felicia Jacinta.
Date: August 05, 2020Proof of Service filed by Anaro, Felicia Jacinta.
Date: July 02, 2020Tentative Ruling published.
Date: July 08, 2020Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 09/22/2020 08:45 AM .
Date: September 22, 2020Tentative Ruling published.
Date: March 17, 2020Case Management Statement filed by Mason-Mcduffie Mortgage Corporation.
Date: June 02, 2020Case Management Statement filed by Mason-Mcduffie Mortgage Corporation.
Date: June 24, 2020Tentative Ruling published.
Date: October 15, 2020Tentative Ruling published.
Date: January 05, 2021Notice of Entry of Minute Order filed by Anaro, Felicia Jacinta.
Date: January 12, 2021Notice of Entry of MINUTE Order filed by U.S. Bank National Association.
Date: November 05, 2020Proof of service filed by Anaro, Felicia Jacinta.
Date: January 12, 2021Notice of Filing Notice of Appeal and Certificate of Service by Mail
Date: May 11, 2021Remittitur filed.
Date: September 07, 2021Notice of Appeal and Proof of Service filed by Anaro, Felicia Jacinta.
Date: May 10, 2021Proof of Service filed by Anaro, Felicia Jacinta.
Date: September 28, 2020Proof of service of Case Management Statement filed by Anaro, Felicia Jacinta.
Date: December 31, 2019Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Anaro, Felicia Jacinta.
Date: October 23, 2018Summons issued and filed.
Date: October 23, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Anaro, Felicia Jacinta.
Date: October 23, 2018Case Management Statement filed by Anaro, Felicia Jacinta.
Date: April 09, 2019Proof of service of CMC statement as to DEFT MERS filed by Anaro, Felicia Jacinta.
Date: April 15, 2019Proof of service of Opposition filed by Anaro, Felicia Jacinta.
Date: December 31, 2019Order filed by Mason-Mcduffie Mortgage Corporation.
Date: October 16, 2020Judgment by Court entered and filed.
Date: February 10, 2021Notice of Entry of Order filed by Mason-Mcduffie Mortgage Corporation.
Date: November 03, 2020Proof of Service by Mail - Civil filed by Mason-Mcduffie Mortgage Corporation.
Date: October 09, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Appeal Disposed.
Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
REMITTITUR FILED RECORD SEALED Remittitur filed. Remittitur filed Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
COURT OF APPEAL ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL FILED RECORD SEALED Court of Appeal Order Dismissing Appeal filed by the Superior Court, County of San Joaquin. Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF APPEAL CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RECORD SEALED Notice of Filing Notice of Appeal and Certificate of Service by Mail Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Appeal.
Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED RECORD SEALED Notice of Appeal and Proof of Service filed by Anaro, Felicia Jacinta. Notice of Appeal (Unlimited) Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing Result: FCMC Vacated
Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Disposed.
Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER FILED RECORD SEALED Notice of Entry of Order filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration System, aka MERS; U.S. Bank National Association; U.S. Bank, N.A.. Notice of Entry of Order Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by U.S. Bank, N.A.; Mortgage Electronic Registration System, aka MERS; U.S. Bank National Association. Notice of Entry of Judgment Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.