Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Franco-Garcia, Elizabeth, Franco, Gerardo, filed a(n) General Property - Property case against Commonwealth Land Title, Aegis Wholesale Corporation, 'Mers' Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc., in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Humphreys, Elizabeth presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management150 days |
|
Filing DateFebruary 02, 2015 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Other Real Property |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions199 days |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Case Cycle Time3715 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Closed.
Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth |
|
February 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 to Offsite,Records Management
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
February 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Payment received for 44A - Copy of any record (per side) in the amount of 1.00 on 02/24/2010, transaction number 484585 and receipt number 113436.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
February 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Civil Records to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
February 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Civil Records
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
December 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Scheduling auto case clock expired.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
December 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Milestone of Disposition 24 months met timely.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
December 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Milestone of Disposition 18 months met timely.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
December 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Milestone of Disposition 12 months met timely.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
December 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Complaint associated on 12/18/2009.
Judge: CONVERSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.