Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
California Mutual Insurance Company, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case against Western Valley Insurance Associates, Inc., in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Kronlund, Barbara presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKronlund, Barbara Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 21, 2022 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Professional Negligence |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseStockton |
This complaint is filed by California Mutual Insurance Company against Western Valley Insurance Associates, Inc. The complaint alleges three causes of action: equitable indemnity, negligent misrepresentation, and agent negligence. The case arises fro...
Case Management Statement filed by Western Valley Insurance Associates, Inc..
Date: January 05, 2023Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Western Valley Insurance Associates, Inc..
Date: September 12, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by California Mutual Insurance Company.
Date: July 21, 2022Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 01/20/2023 08:45 AM .
Date: January 20, 2023Summons issued and filed.
Date: July 21, 2022Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.
Date: July 21, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing regarding: Jury Trial assignment, set for 06/10/2024 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D.
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing re: Case Management Conference held on January 20, 2023.
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
MINUTE_ORDER RTF FILED RECORD SEALED Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 01/20/2023 08:45 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Payment received by Inc. Western Valley Insurance Associates in the amount of $150.00. Receipt number 802734.
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
CM110 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Case Management Statement filed by Western Valley Insurance Associates, Inc.. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED RECORD SEALED defendat Western Valley Insurance Associates, Inc.'s Demand for Jury Trial and Notice of Posting of Jury Fees filed by Western Valley Insurance Associates, Inc.. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Payment received by Inc. Western Valley Insurance Associates in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 771203.
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Attorney, Daniel V. Kohls, retained for Western Valley Insurance Associates, Inc. .
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
ANSWER FILED RECORD SEALED Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Western Valley Insurance Associates, Inc.. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
POS010 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED RECORD SEALED Proof of Service of Summons as to Western Valley Insurance Associates, Inc. served on 08/12/2022 by Substituted Service. $223.19. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.