Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ghotra, Arti Singh, filed a(n) Civil case against Current Auto Performance Group Inc., Elk Grove Ford, Ford Motor Company, Performance Auto Group, Inc., Performance Automotive Group, Inc., (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Kronlund, Barbara presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKronlund, Barbara Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management180 days |
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.
Date: January 15, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ghotra, Arti Singh.
Date: January 15, 2020Summons issued and filed.
Date: January 15, 2020Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Ghotra, Arti Singh.
Date: January 15, 2020Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 07/13/2020 08:45 AM .
Date: July 13, 2020Proof of Service filed by Ghotra, Arti Singh.
Date: October 23, 2020Request for Default against Current Auto Performance Group Inc. Not Entered
Date: October 13, 2020Answer filed by Ford Motor Company.
Date: September 02, 2020Case Management Statement filed by Ford Motor Company.
Date: October 28, 2020Case Management Statement filed by Ghotra, Arti Singh.
Date: November 02, 2020Request for Default against Current Auto Performance Group Inc. Entered
Date: November 05, 2020Defendant Ford Motor Company's Notice of Case Management conference filed by Ford Motor Company.
Date: November 13, 2020Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 11/12/2020 08:45 AM .
Date: November 12, 2020Request for Default against Elk Grove Ford Not Entered
Date: November 17, 2020Stipulated protective order signed by Judge Kronlund entered and filed.
Date: January 14, 2021Stipulation to set aside default and Order signed by Judge Kronlund filed by Elk Grove Ford.
Date: February 01, 2021Defendant Elk Grove Ford's Answer to Complaint filed by Elk Grove Ford.
Date: February 05, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Payment received by Arti Ghotra in the amount of $150.00. Receipt number 632637.
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
TENTATIVERULING PROBATENOTE RTF FILED RECORD SEALED Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
March 19, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
TENTATIVE RULING NOTICE Beginning May 4, 2020, all Civil Departments will resume hearings for all Case Management Conferences, Law and Motion matters, Settlement Conferences and Ex Parte matters. Give...
Judge: Barbara Kronlund |
|
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Payment received by Elk Grove Ford in the amount of $150.00. Receipt number 630660.
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing regarding: Jury Trial assignment, set for 06/15/2022 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D.
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing re: CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on March 17, 2021.
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
MC050 SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY CIVIL WITHOUT COURT ORDER FILED RECORD SEALED Substitution of Attorney filed by Elk Grove Ford. Substitution of Attorney Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Attorney, Brittany B Wilson, retained for Elk Grove Ford .
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
CM 110 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Case Management Statement filed by Ford Motor Company. Case Management Statement Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Case Management Statement filed by Ghotra, Arti Singh. Case Management Statement Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.