Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Garcia, Sandra, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Century Plaza Apts, Llc, City Of Lodi, County Of San Joaquin, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Guy Castillo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGuy Castillo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 19, 2021 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Pi/Pd/Wd (Other) |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseStockton |
This complaint is a personal injury, property damage, and wrongful death case filed by Sandra Garcia against the City of Lodi, County of San Joaquin, Century Plaza Apts, LLC, and Does 1 to 25. The jurisdiction of the case is not specified. The compla...
Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Garcia, Sandra.
Date: March 19, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Garcia, Sandra.
Date: March 19, 2021Summons issued and filed.
Date: March 19, 2021Case Management Statement filed by Garcia, Sandra.
Date: August 13, 2021City of Lodi's Answer to Complaint filed by City of Lodi.
Date: September 08, 2021Case Management Statement filed by City of Lodi.
Date: December 22, 2021Case Management Statement filed by City of Lodi.
Date: September 08, 2021Demand for Jury Trial filed by Century Plaza Apts, LLC.
Date: March 21, 2022Answer to Complaint (amount over $25,000) filed by Century Plaza Apts, LLC.
Date: March 21, 2022Case Management Statement filed by City of Lodi.
Date: March 25, 2022Case Management Statement filed by Century Plaza Apts, LLC.
Date: April 01, 2022Case Management Statement filed by Century Plaza Apts, LLC.
Date: August 31, 2022Case Management Statement filed by City of Lodi.
Date: August 25, 2022Case Management Statement filed by Garcia, Sandra.
Date: September 12, 2022Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 01/13/2022 08:45 AM .
Date: January 13, 2022Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 09/15/2021 08:45 AM .
Date: September 15, 2021Request for Dismissal - Participant entered as to County of San Joaquin.
Date: September 14, 2021Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.
Date: March 19, 2021Case Management Statement filed by Century Plaza Apts, LLC.
Date: April 01, 2022Case Management Statement filed by City of Lodi.
Date: March 25, 2022Answer to Complaint (amount over $25,000) filed by Century Plaza Apts, LLC.
Date: March 21, 2022Demand for Jury Trial filed by Century Plaza Apts, LLC.
Date: March 21, 2022Case Management Statement filed by City of Lodi.
Date: December 22, 2021Case Management Statement filed by City of Lodi.
Date: September 08, 2021City of Lodi's Answer to Complaint filed by City of Lodi.
Date: September 08, 2021Case Management Statement filed by Garcia, Sandra.
Date: August 13, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Garcia, Sandra.
Date: March 19, 2021Summons issued and filed.
Date: March 19, 2021Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Garcia, Sandra.
Date: March 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
CM110 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Case Management Statement filed by Garcia, Sandra. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin |
|
September 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
CMC: Further Case Management Conference scheduled on 09/15/2022 at 8:45 AM has been Continued.
Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin |
|
September 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING FILED RECORD SEALED Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 09/22/2022 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Erin Guy Castillo in Department 10B. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin |
|
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
CM110 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Case Management Statement filed by Century Plaza Apts, LLC. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin |
|
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
CM110 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Case Management Statement filed by City of Lodi. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin |
|
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 09/15/2022 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Erin Guy Castillo in Department 10B.
Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin |
|
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing re: CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on April 18, 2022.
Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin |
|
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
MINUTE_ORDER RTF FILED RECORD SEALED Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 04/18/2022 08:45 AM . Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin |
|
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
CM110 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Case Management Statement filed by Century Plaza Apts, LLC. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin |
|
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
CM110 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Case Management Statement filed by Century Plaza Apts, LLC. Case Management Statement Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.