Case Last Refreshed: 3 hours ago
Bernard Te Velde And Rebecca Dee Te Velde, Trustees Of The 2000 Te Velde Family Trust *,, Holt Repair & Manufacturing, Inc., Mona Tovar, Individually And As Special Administrator Of The Estate Of Carlos Alexander Tovar, Deceased, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Bernard Dee Te Velde And Rebecca Dee Te Velde, Trustees Of The 2000 Te Velde Family Trust, Holt Repairs & Manufacturing, Inc., in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Ross, Roger presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management180 days |
|
Filing DateAugust 30, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedApril 30, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Case Cycle Time487 days |
Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.
Date: August 30, 2018Cross-Complaint filed by Holt Repairs & Manufacturing, Inc..
Date: November 02, 2018Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed by Holt Repairs & Manufacturing, Inc..
Date: October 05, 2018Summons issued and filed.
Date: September 13, 2018Case Management Statement filed by Holt Repairs & Manufacturing, Inc..
Date: February 11, 2019Minutes finalized for CMC: Request for Dismissal held on 12/04/2019 08:30 AM .
Date: December 04, 2019Notice of Further Case Management Conference filed by Tovar, Olivia; Tovar, Izaiah; Tovar, Mona.
Date: December 05, 2019Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 02/26/2019 08:30 AM .
Date: February 26, 2019Tentative Ruling published.
Date: May 06, 2019Minutes finalized for Motion held on 05/08/2019 09:00 AM .
Date: May 08, 2019Notice of Entry of Order filed by Holt Repair & Manufacturing, Inc..
Date: June 27, 2019Tentative Ruling published.
Date: May 28, 2019Notice of Settlement - Conditional filed by Plaintiffs
Date: July 23, 2019Association of Counsel
Date: June 11, 2019Notice of Entry of Order filed by Tovar, Mona.
Date: June 27, 2019Trial Management Order filed.
Date: July 22, 2019Minutes finalized for CMC: Request for Dismissal held on 10/29/2019 08:30 AM .
Date: October 29, 2019Case Management Statement filed by Holt Repair & Manufacturing, Inc..
Date: November 25, 2019Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed by Holt Repairs & Manufacturing, Inc..
Date: October 05, 2018Summons issued and filed.
Date: September 13, 2018Cross-Complaint filed by Holt Repairs & Manufacturing, Inc..
Date: November 02, 2018Case Management Statement filed by Holt Repairs & Manufacturing, Inc..
Date: February 11, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Disposed.
Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Hearing Result: Vacated
Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Tovar, Mona, et al. Request for Dismissal Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
CIV110 REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED RECORD SEALED Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Mona Tovar, Individually and as Special Administrator of the Estate of Carlos Alexander Tovar, Deceased, Izaiah Tovar, Olivia Tovar, Bernard Dee Te Velde and Rebecca Dee Te Velde, Trustees of the 2000 Te Velde Family Trust, Holt Repairs & Manufacturing, Inc., Mona Tovar, Holt Repair & Manufacturing, Inc., Bernard Dee Te Velde and Rebecca Dee Te Velde, Trustees of the 2000 Te Velde Family Trust, Bernard Te Velde and Rebecca Dee Te Velde, Trustees of the 2000 Te Velde Family Trust *, Holt Repair and Manufacturing, Inc.* Entered. Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
December 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE FILED RECORD SEALED Notice of Further Case Management Conference filed by Tovar, Olivia; Tovar, Izaiah; Tovar, Mona. Notice - (Other) Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Hearing regarding: CMC: Request for Dismissal , set for 01/17/2020 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B.
Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Hearing re: CMC: Request for Dismissal held on December 4, 2019.
Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
MINUTEORDER RTF FILED RECORD SEALED Minutes finalized for CMC: Request for Dismissal held on 12/04/2019 08:30 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
November 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION FILED RECORD SEALED Declaration of Spencer J Pahlke re: Dismissal filed by Mona Tovar, Individually and as Special Administrator of the Estate of Carlos Alexander Tovar, Deceased. Declaration Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
CM110 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Case Management Statement filed by Holt Repair & Manufacturing, Inc.. Case Management Statement Judge: Ross, Roger |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.