Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
May, Darla M., filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Thongthinsuthysak, Kevin, Sum, Wendy, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Kronlund, Barbara presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Sum, Wendy; Thongthinsuthysak, Kevin. Notice of Entry of Judgment Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
January 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Disposed.
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
January 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Judgment for Wendy Sum, Kevin Thongthinsuthysak against Darla M. May in the amount of . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER FILED RECORD SEALED Notice of Entry of Order filed by Thongthinsuthysak, Kevin; Sum, Wendy. Notice of Entry of Order Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER FILED RECORD SEALED Order on Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Wendy Sum, Kevin Thongthinsuthysak. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
December 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Hearing Result: Vacated
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
December 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference re judgment, set for 03/06/2020 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D.
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
December 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Hearing Result: Vacated
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
December 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Hearing re: Motion for Summary Judgment held on December 6, 2019.
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
December 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
TENTATIVERULING PROBATENOTE RTF FILED RECORD SEALED Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.