Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
G, Patricia filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Driftwood Apartments, Llc, Boring, Edward, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Holland, Lesley D. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2016 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Pi/Pd/Wd (Other) |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Case Cycle Time2302 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Closed.
Judge: Holland, Lesley D. |
|
May 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
MINUTEORDER RTF FILED RECORD SEALED Minutes finalized for Miscellaneous Hearing held on 05/25/2016 09:00 AM . Judge: Holland, Lesley D. |
|
May 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
Hearing re: Miscellaneous Hearing held on May 25, 2016.
Judge: Holland, Lesley D. |
|
May 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
TENTATIVERULING PROBATENOTE RTF FILED RECORD SEALED Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Holland, Lesley D. |
|
May 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING FILED RECORD SEALED NOTICE OF HEARING FILED RECORD SEALED Hearing regarding: Miscellaneous Hearing PLTF Patricia Gonzales' petition for withdrawal of funds from blocked account, set for 05/25/2016 at 9:00 AM before Hon. unassigned in Department 31. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L. |
|
May 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Payment received by in the amount of $60.00. Receipt number 57064.
Judge: Lofthus, Linda L. |
|
May 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
PETITION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF FUNDS FROM BLOCKED ACCOUNT FILED RECORD SEALED Petition for Withdrawal of Funds from Blocked Account filed by G, Patricia; G., M.. Petition for Withdrawal of Funds from Blocked Account MC-357 Judge: Lofthus, Linda L. |
|
March 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF FUNDS FROM BLOCKED ACCOUNT DENIED BY JUDGE HOLLAND FILED RECORD SEALED Order for Withdrawal of Funds from Blocked Account denied by Judge Holland filed by Patricia G. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L. |
|
February 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
PETITION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF FUNDS FROM BLOCKED ACCOUNT FILED RECORD SEALED Ex Parte Petition for Authority to Withdraw Funds from Blocked Account filed by G, Patricia. Ex Parte Petition for Authority to Withdraw Funds from Blocked Account Judge: Lofthus, Linda L. |
|
February 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF ORDER FOR THE DEPOSIT OF MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT FILED RECORD SEALED Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money into Blocked Account filed by G, Patricia. Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money into Blocked Account MC-356 Judge: Lofthus, Linda L. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.