Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Carl E. Cox, Individually And Doing Business As Carl E. Cox Construction, Beres, Kimberly, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Beres, Kimberly, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Kronlund, Barbara presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2022 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
TENTATIVERULING PROBATENOTE RTF FILED RECORD SEALED Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Payment received in the amount of $20.00, receipt number 707869.
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
January 04, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | TENTATIVE RULING NOTICE Beginning May 4, 2020, all Civil Departments will resume hearings for all Case Management Conferences, Law and Motion matters, Settlement Conferences and Ex Parte matters. Give... | |
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
REPLY FILED RECORD SEALED Reply Defendant/Cross-Complainant Kimberly Beres' Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Attorneys' Fees filed by Beres, Kimberly. Reply Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Disposed.
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT CIVIL FILED RECORD SEALED JUDGMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Judgment for Kimberly Beres against Carl E. Cox individually and dba Carl E. Cox Construction in the amount of 95905.60. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE FILED RECORD SEALED Proof of service filed by Beres, Kimberly. Proof of Service Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED RECORD SEALED Declaration of Dustin J. Dyer In Support of Defendant/Cross-Complainant's Motion for Attorneys' Fees filed by Beres, Kimberly. Declaration in Support Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
MC010 MEMORANDUM OF COSTS SUMMARY FILED RECORD SEALED Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed by Beres, Kimberly. Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED RECORD SEALED Defendant/Cross-Complainant Kimberly Beres' Points and Authorities In Support of Motion For Attorneys' Fees filed by Beres, Kimberly. Memorandum of Points and Authorities Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.