Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Cardoza, Annette, filed a(n) Unlimited Civil Judicial Review - Other case against Bank Of America, N.A., in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Kronlund, Barbara presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKronlund, Barbara Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 28, 2022 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Judicial Review - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Bank of America, N.A..
Date: September 29, 2022Reply to Opposition to Motion for Trial Setting Precedence filed by Cardoza, Annette.
Date: December 05, 2022Minutes finalized for Ex Parte held on 12/02/2022 03:22 PM .
Date: December 02, 2022Disqualification of Judge under CCP 170.1(a)(3) and Notice of Judicial Reassignment
Date: December 07, 2022Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Cardoza, Annette.
Date: July 28, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cardoza, Annette.
Date: July 28, 2022Summons issued and filed.
Date: July 28, 2022Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.
Date: July 28, 2022Proof of Service by Mail - Civil filed by Cardoza, Annette.
Date: November 07, 2022Tentative Ruling published.
Date: December 12, 2022Tentative Ruling published.
Date: January 04, 2023Tentative Ruling published.
Date: January 04, 2023Minutes finalized for Motion held on 12/13/2022 09:00 AM .
Date: December 13, 2022Tentative Ruling published.
Date: January 18, 2023Minutes finalized for Motion, Motion for Leave held on 01/05/2023 09:00 AM .
Date: January 05, 2023Case Management Statement filed by Cardoza, Annette.
Date: January 12, 2023Case Management Statement filed by Bank of America, N.A..
Date: January 09, 2023Tentative Ruling published.
Date: January 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
TENTATIVERULING PROBATENOTE RTF FILED RECORD SEALED Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
TENTATIVERULING PROBATENOTE RTF FILED RECORD SEALED Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
CM110 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Case Management Statement filed by Cardoza, Annette. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
CM110 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Case Management Statement filed by Bank of America, N.A.. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing regarding: Motion Plaintiffs Motion for Trial Setting, set for 01/19/2023 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D.
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing regarding: Motion for Leave Deft's Motion for Leave, set for 01/19/2023 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D.
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiffs Motion for Trial Setting scheduled on 01/05/2023 at 9:00 AM has been Continued.
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Leave Deft's Motion for Leave scheduled on 01/05/2023 at 9:00 AM has been Continued.
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
MINUTE_ORDER RTF FILED RECORD SEALED Minutes finalized for Motion, Motion for Leave held on 01/05/2023 09:00 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
TENTATIVERULING PROBATENOTE RTF FILED RECORD SEALED Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.