Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Patrick Drew, Mathew Drew, And Individual, Maralee Drew, An Individual, National Interstate Insurance Company, An Ohio Corporation, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case against Williams Tank Lines, Inc., A California Corporation, Patrick Drew, An Individual Citizen And Resident Of California, Matthew Drew, An Individual Citizen And Resident Of Nevada, Maralee Drew, An Individual Citizen And Resident Of Nevada, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Ross, Roger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRoss, Roger Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management180 days |
Filing DateMay 29, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
|
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
|
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Attorney, S. Dean Ruiz, retained for Williams Tank Lines, Inc., a California corporation .
Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
November 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing Result: Vacated
Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
November 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
MINUTEORDER RTF FILED RECORD SEALED Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 11/25/2020 08:30 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
November 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference (to coincide with motion)., set for 02/24/2021 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B.
Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
November 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing re: Case Management Conference held on November 25, 2020.
Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
November 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing regarding: Motion for Summary Judgment/Adj. , set for 02/24/2021 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B.
Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Payment received by an National Interstate Insurance Company in the amount of $150.00. Receipt number 601607.
Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
November 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
CM110 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Case Management Statement filed by Patrick Drew, an individual citizen and resident of California; Maralee Drew, an individual citizen and resident of Nevada; Matthew Drew, an individual citizen and resident of Nevada. Case Management Statement Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
CM110 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Case Management Statement filed by National Interstate Insurance Company, an Ohio corporation. Case Management Statement Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE FILED RECORD SEALED National Interstate Insurance Company's Amended Notice of Motion and Motion For Summary Judgment Or, In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication Against Defendants Maralee Drew, Matthew Drew and Patrick Drew filed by National Interstate Insurance Company, an Ohio corporation. MSJ/MSA Supporting Documents Judge: Ross, Roger |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.