Case Last Refreshed: 17 hours ago
Page, Tracy B, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case against American General Life Insurance Company Aka Aig, A Texas Corporation, Loew, Jeffrey, Taylor, Larry, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Kronlund, Barbara presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKronlund, Barbara Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 14, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedApril 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Summons issued and filed.
Date: December 14, 2020Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Page, Tracy B.
Date: December 14, 2020Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Tracy B Page.
Date: December 15, 2020Tentative Ruling published.
Date: March 23, 2021Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.
Date: December 14, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Page, Tracy B.
Date: December 14, 2020Notice of Hearing on Jeffrey Loew's Demurrer to Complaint filed by Loew, Jeffrey.
Date: February 25, 2021Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint; Order entered and filed.
Date: April 26, 2021Case Management Statement filed by Page, Tracy B.
Date: May 11, 2021Defendant Jeffrey Loew's Demurrer to Complaint (amount over $25,000) filed by Loew, Jeffrey.
Date: February 25, 2021Case Management Statement filed by Loew, Jeffrey.
Date: May 11, 2021Tentative Ruling published.
Date: May 20, 2021Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address filed by Page, Tracy B.
Date: February 26, 2021First Amended Verified Complaint filed by Page, Tracy B.
Date: June 24, 2021Minutes finalized for Demurrer held on 03/25/2021 09:00 AM .
Date: March 25, 2021Minutes finalized for Demurrer held on 05/25/2021 09:00 AM .
Date: May 25, 2021Notice of Further Case Management Conference filed by Loew, Jeffrey.
Date: May 28, 2021Order Sustaining Demurrer with Leave to Amend filed by Jeffrey Loew.
Date: June 07, 2021Notice of Entry of Order filed by Loew, Jeffrey.
Date: June 25, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | TENTATIVE RULING NOTICE Tentative rulings for Law and Motion will be posted electronically by 1:30 p.m. the day before the hearing. Any party wishing to contest or argue the tentative ruling must emai... | |
August 02, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | TENTATIVE RULING NOTICE Tentative rulings for Law and Motion will be posted electronically by 1:30 p.m. the day before the hearing. Any party wishing to contest or argue the tentative ruling must emai... | |
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
TENTATIVERULING PROBATENOTE RTF FILED RECORD SEALED Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
November 05, 2021 | Tentative Ruling | TENTATIVE RULING NOTICE Tentative rulings for Law and Motion will be posted electronically by 1:30 p.m. the day before the hearing. Any party wishing to contest or argue the tentative ruling must emai... | |
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
CM110 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Case Management Statement filed by American General Life Insurance Company AKA AIG, a Texas corporation. Case Management Statement Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference scheduled on 09/21/2021 at 8:45 AM has been Continued.
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 11/10/2021 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D.
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing regarding: Demurrer Defendant American General Life Insurance Company's Demurrer to First Amended Complaint, set for 11/10/2021 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D.
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing regarding: Demurrer Defendant Jeffrey Loew's Demurrer to First Amended Complaint, set for 11/10/2021 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D.
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Demurrer Defendant Jeffrey Loew's Demurrer to First Amended Complaint scheduled on 09/09/2021 at 9:00 AM has been Continued.
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.