Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, Acting By And Through The Department Of Transportation, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case against 88 Investments, Inc., A California Corporation Dba 88 Market & Grill, Alborati, Abdol, Alburati, Omar, Alburati, Yosef, County Of San Joaquin, (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Abdallah, George J. presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management221 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 02, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
|
Filing Court HouseStockton |
This complaint is a legal document filed by the Department of Transportation of the State of California in the Superior Court of San Joaquin County. The Department is seeking to acquire certain real property for state highway purposes through the pow...
Summons issued and filed.
Date: December 02, 2019Request for Default against Abdol Alborati Entered
Date: March 09, 2020Request for Default against Yosef Alburati Not Entered
Date: June 01, 2020Request for Default against Omar Alburati Not Entered
Date: June 01, 2020Request for Default against Abdol Alborati Not Entered
Date: March 03, 2020Request for Default against Yasir Khanshali Entered
Date: February 26, 2020Request for Default against Yasir Khanshali Not Entered
Date: February 19, 2020Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.
Date: December 02, 2019Tentative Ruling published.
Date: November 30, 2020Case Management Statement filed by Mehrten, Joseph H; Mehrten, Daniel B; Mehrten, Roger J.
Date: November 16, 2020Tentative Ruling published.
Date: October 27, 2020Minutes finalized for Motion for Order held on 10/28/2020 09:00 AM .
Date: October 28, 2020Request for Default against Yosef Alburati Entered
Date: October 21, 2020Request for Default against Omar Alburati Entered
Date: October 21, 2020Request for Default against Yosef Alburati Not Entered
Date: August 28, 2020Request for Default against Omar Alburati Not Entered
Date: August 28, 2020Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 07/10/2020 08:45 AM .
Date: July 10, 2020Summons issued and filed.
Date: December 02, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
CM110 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Case Management Statement filed by The People of the State of California, acting by and through the Department of Transportation. Case Management Statement Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 02/17/2022 at 8:45 AM before Hon. George J. Abdallah in Department 10A.
Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing re: CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on August 11, 2021.
Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
MINUTEORDER RTF FILED RECORD SEALED Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 08/11/2021 08:45 AM . Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
CM110 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Case Management Statement filed by Mehrten, Joseph H; Mehrten, Daniel B; Mehrten, Roger J. Case Management Statement Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
CM110 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Case Management Statement filed by The People of the State of California, acting by and through the Department of Transportation. Case Management Statement Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE FILED RECORD SEALED Proof of Service of Order on Notice of Related Cases filed by The People of the State of California, acting by and through the Department of Transportation. Proof of Service Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case associated with case: , STK-CV-UED-2020-0001176, STK-CV-UED-2020-0010694
Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case associated with case: , STK-CV-UED-2020-0010694
Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER FILED RECORD SEALED Order on Notice of Related Cases filed by The People of the State of California, acting by and through the Department of Transportation. Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.