Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Stewart, Sannette, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Sauls, Danish, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Guy Castillo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGuy Castillo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2019 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil - Civil Harassment |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Minutes finalized for OSC Re: Harassment held on 02/19/2019 01:30 PM .
Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin |
|
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Hearing re: OSC Re: Harassment held on February 19, 2019.
Judge: Johnson, William D. |
|
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Sheriff (Fee Waived) as to Danish Sauls served on 02/05/2019 by Personal Service. $40.00.
Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin |
|
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Hearing regarding: OSC Re: Harassment , set for 02/19/2019 at 1:30 PM before Hon. William D. Johnson in Department 6C.
Judge: Johnson, William D. |
|
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Court Hearing - TRO filed by Sannette Stewart.
Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin |
|
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order Granted and filed on 01/31/2019.
Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin |
|
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Stewart, Sannette. Civil Case Cover Sheet Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin |
|
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case initiated.
Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin |
|
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Civil Restraining Order Notice to Filing Party.
Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin |
|
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Orders to Stop Harassment with Violence (Civil Harassment) filed by Stewart, Sannette. Request for Orders to Stop Harassment with Violence (Civil Harassment) Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.